Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Accidents

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329
Title
Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation (Ryan's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344 (SB0751)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement and Workers' Compensation Benefits - Offsets
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 (SB0051)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267
Title
Workers' Compensation - Members of Volunteer Company - Computation of Average Weekly Wage
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1476 /CH0565 (SB0867/CH0566)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Failure to Report Accidental Personal Injury - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1536 (SB1079)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Athletic Trainers - Scope of Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0051 (HB0559)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144
Title
Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751 (HB0344)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement and Workers' Compensation Benefits - Offsets
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0867 /CH0566 (HB1476/CH0565)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Failure to Report Accidental Personal Injury - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1079 (HB1536)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Athletic Trainers - Scope of Practice
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0329 Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation (Ryan's Law) Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/01/2017 - 3:00 PM
HB0344 (SB0751) State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement and Workers' Compensation Benefits - Offsets Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0559 (SB0051) Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1267 Workers' Compensation - Members of Volunteer Company - Computation of Average Weekly Wage Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1476 /CH0565 (SB0867/CH0566) Workers' Compensation - Failure to Report Accidental Personal Injury - Penalty Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Economic Matters
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1536 (SB1079) State Board of Physicians - Athletic Trainers - Scope of Practice Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0051 (HB0559) Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 PM
SB0144 Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0751 (HB0344) State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement and Workers' Compensation Benefits - Offsets Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 8:30 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2017 - 8:30 AM
Finance
SB0867 /CH0566 (HB1476/CH0565) Workers' Compensation - Failure to Report Accidental Personal Injury - Penalty Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB1079 (HB1536) State Board of Physicians - Athletic Trainers - Scope of Practice Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM