Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Accidents

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0486
Title
Corporal William Kyle Ferrell Emergency Vehicle Safety Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 (SB0934)
Title
Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Lifeline Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 (SB0512)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736 (SB0565)
Title
Police Officers - Mental Health - Employee Assistance Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324
Title
Workgroup on Statewide Vehicle Crash Data Collection and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1381
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Danshaun's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1418
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1464
Title
Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Data - Ownership and Use
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0512 (HB0721)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755
Title
Education - Harford County - Liability of School Bus Contractors
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB0660)
Title
Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Lifeline Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0486 Corporal William Kyle Ferrell Emergency Vehicle Safety Act Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0660 (SB0934) Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Lifeline Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0721 (SB0512) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0736 (SB0565) Police Officers - Mental Health - Employee Assistance Programs Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 Workgroup on Statewide Vehicle Crash Data Collection and Reporting Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1381 Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Danshaun's Law) Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1418 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1464 Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Data - Ownership and Use Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0512 (HB0721) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0755 Education - Harford County - Liability of School Bus Contractors Harford County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0934 (HB0660) Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Lifeline Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:27 PM