Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Accountants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0468 (SB0465/CH0036)
Title
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878 /CH0110 (SB0536)
Title
Certified Public Accountants - Definitions - Attest and Practice Certified Public Accountancy
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465 /CH0036 (HB0468)
Title
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0536 (HB0878/CH0110)
Title
Certified Public Accountants - Definitions - Attest and Practice Certified Public Accountancy
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0468 (SB0465/CH0036) Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company Delegate Jameson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0878 /CH0110 (SB0536) Certified Public Accountants - Definitions - Attest and Practice Certified Public Accountancy Delegate Vaughn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Economic Matters
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0465 /CH0036 (HB0468) Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Finance
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0536 (HB0878/CH0110) Certified Public Accountants - Definitions - Attest and Practice Certified Public Accountancy Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM