Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Accountants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272 /CH0601 (SB0234/CH0602)
Title
Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0470 (SB0371)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081 /CH0329 (SB0513/CH0330)
Title
State Board of Public Accountancy - Firm Permits - Attest Services
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1420 /CH0390
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Services for Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Fee-for-Service Payment Pilot Program
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428 /CH0019
Title
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 /CH0602 (HB0272/CH0601)
Title
Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 (HB0470)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0619 /CH0018
Title
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0272 /CH0601 (SB0234/CH0602) Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0470 (SB0371) State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1081 /CH0329 (SB0513/CH0330) State Board of Public Accountancy - Firm Permits - Attest Services Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Economic Matters
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1420 /CH0390 Maryland Department of Health - Services for Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Fee-for-Service Payment Pilot Program Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1428 /CH0019 University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0234 /CH0602 (HB0272/CH0601) Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 602
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0371 (HB0470) State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice Senator West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0619 /CH0018 University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits Senator Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:16 PM