Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Acupuncturists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0206 (SB0237/CH0211)
Title
Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1115 /CH0404 (SB0593)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290 (SB0837)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays
Sponsor
Delegate Frank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0237 /CH0211 (HB0206)
Title
Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0593 (HB1115/CH0404)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Senator Conway
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB1290)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0206 (SB0237/CH0211) Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Delegate Hammen 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1115 /CH0404 (SB0593) Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
HB1290 (SB0837) Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays Delegate Frank 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0237 /CH0211 (HB0206) Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0593 (HB1115/CH0404) Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability Senator Montgomery 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Senator Conway 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB1290) Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM