Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Acupuncturists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404 /CH0543 (SB0303)
Title
State Acupuncture Board - Practice of Acupuncture - Definition and Education Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547 (SB0900)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors - Formulary Content and Scope of Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0900 (HB0547)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors - Formulary Content and Scope of Practice
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1009
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Acupuncture Services
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0404 /CH0543 (SB0303) State Acupuncture Board - Practice of Acupuncture - Definition and Education Requirements Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0547 (SB0900) State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors - Formulary Content and Scope of Practice Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0900 (HB0547) State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors - Formulary Content and Scope of Practice Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1009 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage - Acupuncture Services Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:16 PM