Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Administrative Hearings, Office of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 (SB0585)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195 (SB0877)
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585 (HB0553)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1195)
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2015 - 3:00 PM
Rules
HB0553 (SB0585) Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1195 (SB0877) Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015 Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies President 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0585 (HB0553) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0877 (HB1195) Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015 Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM