Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Administrative Hearings, Office of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0377 (SB0513)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410 /CH0664 (SB0266/CH0663)
Title
Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0709 /CH0672 (SB0422/CH0671)
Title
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0778
Title
Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program Process
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855 /CH0555 (SB0439/CH0554)
Title
Correctional Training Commission - Department of Juvenile Services Employees - Revocation of Certification and Reinstatement
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 /CH0663 (HB0410/CH0664)
Title
Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422 /CH0671 (HB0709/CH0672)
Title
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 /CH0554 (HB0855/CH0555)
Title
Correctional Training Commission - Department of Juvenile Services Employees - Revocation of Certification and Reinstatement
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513 (HB0377)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0377 (SB0513) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0410 /CH0664 (SB0266/CH0663) Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016 Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0709 /CH0672 (SB0422/CH0671) Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Funding Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 672
Ways and Means
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0778 Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program Process Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0855 /CH0555 (SB0439/CH0554) Correctional Training Commission - Department of Juvenile Services Employees - Revocation of Certification and Reinstatement Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0101 Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0266 /CH0663 (HB0410/CH0664) Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016 Senator Salling 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0422 /CH0671 (HB0709/CH0672) Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Funding Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0439 /CH0554 (HB0855/CH0555) Correctional Training Commission - Department of Juvenile Services Employees - Revocation of Certification and Reinstatement Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0513 (HB0377) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM