Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Administrative Hearings, Office of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1343 (SB1000)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Child Support - Lien Against Monetary Award
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750
Title
Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Release Hearing - Exceptions
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843
Title
Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1343)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1343 (SB1000) Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0023 Child Support - Lien Against Monetary Award Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0750 Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Release Hearing - Exceptions Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0843 Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB1000 (HB1343) Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal Senator Beidle 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Executive Nominations
3/08/2019 - 9:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:16 PM