Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Administrative Office of the Courts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0197 (SB0271)
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687 /CH0633
Title
Commission on Child Custody Decision Making
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Location Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271 (HB0197)
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0197 (SB0271) Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0687 /CH0633 Commission on Child Custody Decision Making Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0887 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Location Privacy Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0271 (HB0197) Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Penalties Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM