Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Administrative Office of the Courts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0051 /CH0487 (SB0066)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053 (SB0063)
Title
Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 /CH0488 (SB0064)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0468)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402 (SB0188)
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063 (HB0053)
Title
Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 (HB0054/CH0488)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066 (HB0051/CH0487)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188 (HB0402)
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468 (HB0348)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0051 /CH0487 (SB0066) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Appropriations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0053 (SB0063) Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0054 /CH0488 (SB0064) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
Judiciary
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0348 (SB0468) Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0402 (SB0188) Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0063 (HB0053) Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0064 (HB0054/CH0488) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0066 (HB0051/CH0487) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0188 (HB0402) Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0468 (HB0348) Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM