Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Administrative Office of the Courts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082 /CH0573 (SB1060/CH0574)
Title
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1060 /CH0574 (HB1082/CH0573)
Title
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0840 Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1082 /CH0573 (SB1060/CH0574) Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act) Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1060 /CH0574 (HB1082/CH0573) Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act) Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM