Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Administrative Office of the Courts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013 (SB0238)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760 (SB0566)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Citations - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330 /CH0038 (SB0594/CH0039)
Title
State Law Library - Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0124 /CH0466
Title
Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Court Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566 (HB0760)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Citations - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0594 /CH0039 (HB1330/CH0038)
Title
State Law Library - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0013 (SB0238) Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0760 (SB0566) Criminal Procedure - Criminal Citations - Reporting Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0914 Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1330 /CH0038 (SB0594/CH0039) State Law Library - Renaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0124 /CH0466 Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Court Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program - Extension Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0566 (HB0760) Criminal Procedure - Criminal Citations - Reporting Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0594 /CH0039 (HB1330/CH0038) State Law Library - Renaming Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:16 PM