Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Administrative Office of the Courts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0075
Title
Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information on Judge or Magistrate
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0262 /CH0141
Title
Criminal Procedure - Examination of Defendant by Maryland Department of Health - Access to Judicial Records
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0311 /CH0161 (SB0101/CH0162)
Title
Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0339
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 (SB0268)
Title
Victim's Rights - Restitution
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529 (SB0256)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Surcharge on Recordable Instruments
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797 (SB0544)
Title
State Court Administrator - Warrants of Restitution and Writs of Possession - Data Collection and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009 (SB0889)
Title
Adjudicatory Hearings - Attorney Security Passes for Attorneys in Good Standing
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1134 (SB0388)
Title
Circuit Court and District Court of Maryland Employees – Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181 /CH0440
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Data Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1662
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Records - Aliases
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101 /CH0162 (HB0311/CH0161)
Title
Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0358)
Title
Victim's Rights - Restitution
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0388 (HB1134)
Title
Circuit Courts and District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0544 (HB0797)
Title
State Court Administrator - Warrants of Restitution and Writs of Possession - Data Collection and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574
Title
Baltimore City – District Court – Jobs Court Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889 (HB1009)
Title
Adjudicatory Hearings - Attorney Security Passes for Attorneys in Good Standing
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0075 Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information on Judge or Magistrate Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/22/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0262 /CH0141 Criminal Procedure - Examination of Defendant by Maryland Department of Health - Access to Judicial Records Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 141
Judiciary
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0311 /CH0161 (SB0101/CH0162) Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established Delegate Malone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 161
Judiciary
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0339 Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0358 (SB0268) Victim's Rights - Restitution Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0529 (SB0256) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Surcharge on Recordable Instruments Delegate McIntosh 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Judiciary
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0797 (SB0544) State Court Administrator - Warrants of Restitution and Writs of Possession - Data Collection and Reporting Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1009 (SB0889) Adjudicatory Hearings - Attorney Security Passes for Attorneys in Good Standing Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1134 (SB0388) Circuit Court and District Court of Maryland Employees – Collective Bargaining Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1181 /CH0440 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Data Collection Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 440
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1662 Criminal Procedure - Criminal Records - Aliases Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0101 /CH0162 (HB0311/CH0161) Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established Senator Simonaire 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 162
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2020 - 2:15 PM
Judiciary
SB0268 (HB0358) Victim's Rights - Restitution President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0388 (HB1134) Circuit Courts and District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0544 (HB0797) State Court Administrator - Warrants of Restitution and Writs of Possession - Data Collection and Reporting Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0574 Baltimore City – District Court – Jobs Court Pilot Program Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
SB0889 (HB1009) Adjudicatory Hearings - Attorney Security Passes for Attorneys in Good Standing Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 2:02 PM