Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Administrative Procedure Act

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016 (SB0261)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0241
Title
Administrative Procedure Act - Proposed Regulations - Public Hearings and Voting
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 (HB0016)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1008
Title
Sewage Sludge Utilization Permits - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Judicial Review
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 (SB0261) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0241 Administrative Procedure Act - Proposed Regulations - Public Hearings and Voting Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2013 - 1:45 PM
SB0261 (HB0016) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1008 Sewage Sludge Utilization Permits - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Judicial Review Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM