Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Administrative Procedure Act

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1193 (SB0067)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1495 (SB0942/CH0704)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Contested Cases - Judicial Review
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1631 (SB1168)
Title
Administrative Procedure Act - Proposed Regulation - Explanatory Reasons Justifying Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 (HB1193)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0942 /CH0704 (HB1495)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Contested Cases - Judicial Review
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1168 (HB1631)
Title
Administrative Procedure Act - Proposed Regulation - Explanatory Reasons Justifying Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1193 (SB0067) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Delegate Platt 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1495 (SB0942/CH0704) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Contested Cases - Judicial Review Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1631 (SB1168) Administrative Procedure Act - Proposed Regulation - Explanatory Reasons Justifying Adoption Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0067 (HB1193) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0942 /CH0704 (HB1495) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Contested Cases - Judicial Review Senator Ramirez 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB1168 (HB1631) Administrative Procedure Act - Proposed Regulation - Explanatory Reasons Justifying Adoption Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page