Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Admissions and Amusement Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203
Title
Economic Development - Arts, Business, and Cultural District - Pennsylvania Avenue Corridor in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0384
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Returns and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0412 (SB0451)
Title
Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement Tax
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1036
Title
Baltimore City - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Additional Tax on Nonresidents
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0451 (HB0412)
Title
Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement Tax
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830
Title
Transportation Financing Act
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0203 Economic Development - Arts, Business, and Cultural District - Pennsylvania Avenue Corridor in Baltimore City Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0384 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Returns and Penalties Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0412 (SB0451) Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement Tax Delegate George 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1036 Baltimore City - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Additional Tax on Nonresidents Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0451 (HB0412) Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement Tax Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0830 Transportation Financing Act Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM