Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Admissions and Amusement Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347 (SB0365)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140
Title
Local Gaming - Charitable Casino Events
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231
Title
Baltimore City - Charitable Gaming Events - Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1516 (SB1054/CH0576)
Title
Economic Development - Arts and Entertainment Districts - Qualifying Residing Artists
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0347)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 /CH0576 (HB1516)
Title
Economic Development - Arts and Entertainment Districts - Qualifying Residing Artists
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0347 (SB0365) Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1140 Local Gaming - Charitable Casino Events Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1231 Baltimore City - Charitable Gaming Events - Nonprofit Organizations Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1516 (SB1054/CH0576) Economic Development - Arts and Entertainment Districts - Qualifying Residing Artists Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Ways and Means
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0365 (HB0347) Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1054 /CH0576 (HB1516) Economic Development - Arts and Entertainment Districts - Qualifying Residing Artists Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 576
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM