Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Admissions and Amusement Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0333
Title
Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233 (SB0763/CH0050)
Title
Tax Amnesty Program
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 /CH0334
Title
Calvert County - Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 /CH0050 (HB1233)
Title
Tax Amnesty Program
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0333 Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1233 (SB0763/CH0050) Tax Amnesty Program Delegate Walker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0265 /CH0334 Calvert County - Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0763 /CH0050 (HB1233) Tax Amnesty Program Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM