Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Admissions and Amusement Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624 (SB0506)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0842
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption for School Field Trips
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1286
Title
Harford County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations in Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0506 (HB0624)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism and Promotion of Agricultural Products
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0624 (SB0506) Anne Arundel County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0842 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption for School Field Trips Delegate Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1286 Harford County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations in Municipal Corporations Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0506 (HB0624) Anne Arundel County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0716 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism and Promotion of Agricultural Products Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM