Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Adoption

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0022 (SB0165)
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsor
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278 (SB0265/CH0037)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361 /CH0368
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0371
Title
Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 (SB0393)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0563 /CH0619
Title
Adoption - Payment of Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0715 (SB0620)
Title
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099 (SB0792)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1297 /CH0330 (SB0897/CH0329)
Title
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331
Title
Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1334
Title
Employment Discrimination - Leave for Pregnancy and Childbirth
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1478
Title
Baltimore County - Division of Animal Control - Treatment of Unclaimed Dogs or Cats
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0165 (HB0022)
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 /CH0037 (HB0278)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 (HB0449)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0620 (HB0715)
Title
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 (HB1099)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802
Title
Department of Human Resources - Adoption Awareness Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0897 /CH0329 (HB1297/CH0330)
Title
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0022 (SB0165) Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services Delegate Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0278 (SB0265/CH0037) Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0361 /CH0368 Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0371 Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0449 (SB0393) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0563 /CH0619 Adoption - Payment of Expenses Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0715 (SB0620) Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1099 (SB0792) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1297 /CH0330 (SB0897/CH0329) Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings Delegate Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1331 Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child Delegate Kelly, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1334 Employment Discrimination - Leave for Pregnancy and Childbirth Delegate Kelly, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
Appropriations
HB1478 Baltimore County - Division of Animal Control - Treatment of Unclaimed Dogs or Cats Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0165 (HB0022) Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0265 /CH0037 (HB0278) Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0393 (HB0449) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 12:00 PM
SB0620 (HB0715) Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 (HB1099) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0802 Department of Human Resources - Adoption Awareness Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0897 /CH0329 (HB1297/CH0330) Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Finance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM