Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Adoption

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 (SB0273)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0418 (SB0267)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503 (SB0078)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 /CH0435
Title
State Personnel - Limits on Use of Leave for Birth, Adoption, Foster Placement, or Care of Child
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567
Title
Crimes Relating to Animals - Failure to Offer Dogs and Cats Used in Research Facilities for Adoption - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0776 (SB0687)
Title
State Personnel - Parental Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876
Title
Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelter Standards Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1125 (SB0208)
Title
Family Law - Rehoming of Adopted Children
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078 (HB0503)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB1125)
Title
Family Law - Rehoming of Adopted Children
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 (HB0418)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 (HB0220)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0687 (HB0776)
Title
State Personnel - Parental Leave
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0220 (SB0273) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0418 (SB0267) Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0503 (SB0078) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0564 /CH0435 State Personnel - Limits on Use of Leave for Birth, Adoption, Foster Placement, or Care of Child Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0567 Crimes Relating to Animals - Failure to Offer Dogs and Cats Used in Research Facilities for Adoption - Penalties Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
HB0776 (SB0687) State Personnel - Parental Leave Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0876 Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelter Standards Act of 2015) Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1125 (SB0208) Family Law - Rehoming of Adopted Children Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0078 (HB0503) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0208 (HB1125) Family Law - Rehoming of Adopted Children Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0267 (HB0418) Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 (HB0220) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0687 (HB0776) State Personnel - Parental Leave Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM