Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732 (SB0675/CH0236)
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775 (SB0859/CH0752)
Title
State Employees - Parental Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0787 /CH0827 (SB0629/CH0828)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425
Title
Family Law - Guardianship and Adoption - Age of Consent and Revocation of Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1567
Title
Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1628
Title
Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060
Title
Family Law - Same-Sex Couples - Marital Presumption and Expedited Second Parent Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629 /CH0828 (HB0787/CH0827)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 /CH0236 (HB0732)
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0859 /CH0752 (HB0775)
Title
State Employees – Parental Leave
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0732 (SB0675/CH0236) Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018 Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0775 (SB0859/CH0752) State Employees - Parental Leave Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0787 /CH0827 (SB0629/CH0828) Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827
Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1425 Family Law - Guardianship and Adoption - Age of Consent and Revocation of Consent Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1567 Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1628 Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0060 Family Law - Same-Sex Couples - Marital Presumption and Expedited Second Parent Adoption Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0629 /CH0828 (HB0787/CH0827) Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0675 /CH0236 (HB0732) Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018 Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0859 /CH0752 (HB0775) State Employees – Parental Leave Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 752
Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM