Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057
Title
Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0096
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption - Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0114
Title
Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Waiver of Adoption Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0369 (SB0586)
Title
Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers - Right to Intervene
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503 (SB0391)
Title
Primary and Secondary Schools - Dependent Children of Service Members - Enrollment and Documentation Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0629
Title
Maryland College Investment Plan - State Contribution Incentives
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0539)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1039 (SB0743)
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1143
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Contracts - Employment After Contract Termination
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0128
Title
Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391 (HB0503)
Title
Primary and Secondary Schools - Dependent Children of Service Members - Enrollment and Documentation Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0839)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585
Title
Family Law - Children in Out-of-Home Placements - Mandatory Concurrent Planning
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586 (HB0369)
Title
Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers - Right to Intervene
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 (HB1039)
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0096 Family Law - Parentage and Adoption - Definitions Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0114 Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Waiver of Adoption Fee Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0369 (SB0586) Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers - Right to Intervene Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0503 (SB0391) Primary and Secondary Schools - Dependent Children of Service Members - Enrollment and Documentation Requirements Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0629 Maryland College Investment Plan - State Contribution Incentives Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 (SB0539) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1039 (SB0743) Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1143 Labor and Employment - Employment Contracts - Employment After Contract Termination Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0128 Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2020) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0391 (HB0503) Primary and Secondary Schools - Dependent Children of Service Members - Enrollment and Documentation Requirements Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0539 (HB0839) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0585 Family Law - Children in Out-of-Home Placements - Mandatory Concurrent Planning Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0586 (HB0369) Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers - Right to Intervene Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 (HB1039) Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 11:10 AM