Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Advance Medical Directives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 /CH0274 (SB0460/CH0273)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0915 (SB0790/CH0549)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advance Directive Registry - Fee and Date of Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 /CH0273 (HB0723/CH0274)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0790 /CH0549 (HB0915)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advance Directive Registry - Fee and Date of Operation
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0723 /CH0274 (SB0460/CH0273) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice Delegate Tarrant 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0915 (SB0790/CH0549) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advance Directive Registry - Fee and Date of Operation Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
SB0460 /CH0273 (HB0723/CH0274) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0790 /CH0549 (HB0915) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advance Directive Registry - Fee and Date of Operation Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM