Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Advance Medical Directives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0767 (SB0831)
Title
Public Health - Mental Hygiene Law - Assisted Outpatient Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Murphy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267 /CH0353 (SB0882/CH0352)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0831 (HB0767)
Title
Public Health - Mental Hygiene Law - Assisted Outpatient Treatment
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0882 /CH0352 (HB1267/CH0353)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0767 (SB0831) Public Health - Mental Hygiene Law - Assisted Outpatient Treatment Delegate Murphy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1267 /CH0353 (SB0882/CH0352) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0831 (HB0767) Public Health - Mental Hygiene Law - Assisted Outpatient Treatment Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0882 /CH0352 (HB1267/CH0353) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM