Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Advance Medical Directives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0118
Title
Task Force to Study Presumed Consent Organ Donation in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0293 /CH0412 (SB0090)
Title
Guardianship of Disabled Persons and Revocation of Advance Directives
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1106 /CH0297
Title
Public Health - Electronic Advance Directives - Witness Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 (HB0293/CH0412)
Title
Guardianship of Disabled Persons and Revocation of Advance Directives
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2015 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0118 Task Force to Study Presumed Consent Organ Donation in Maryland Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0293 /CH0412 (SB0090) Guardianship of Disabled Persons and Revocation of Advance Directives Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2015 - 12:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1106 /CH0297 Public Health - Electronic Advance Directives - Witness Requirements Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0090 (HB0293/CH0412) Guardianship of Disabled Persons and Revocation of Advance Directives Senator Kelley 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM