Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Advance Medical Directives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0091 /CH0389 (SB0442/CH0388)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0441
Title
Public Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment and Mobile Crisis Teams
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385 /CH0510
Title
Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance Directives
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 /CH0388 (HB0091/CH0389)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0091 /CH0389 (SB0442/CH0388) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2016 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0441 Public Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment and Mobile Crisis Teams Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1385 /CH0510 Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance Directives Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0442 /CH0388 (HB0091/CH0389) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions Day Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM