Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Advance Medical Directives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188 /CH0667
Title
Public Health - Advance Directives - Witness Requirements, Advance Directives Services, and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 (SB0354)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498 /CH0657 (SB0562)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 (HB0370)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0562 (HB0498/CH0657)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0188 /CH0667 Public Health - Advance Directives - Witness Requirements, Advance Directives Services, and Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 667
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0370 (SB0354) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0498 /CH0657 (SB0562) Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0354 (HB0370) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0562 (HB0498/CH0657) Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals Senator Kelley 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM