Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Advance Medical Directives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145 /CH0285 (SB0301/CH0286)
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0399 (SB0311)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0301 /CH0286 (HB0145/CH0285)
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 (HB0399)
Title
End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act)
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation - End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0145 /CH0285 (SB0301/CH0286) Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2019 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0399 (SB0311) End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act) Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2019 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
2/15/2019 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0301 /CH0286 (HB0145/CH0285) Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0311 (HB0399) End-of-Life Option Act (Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Act) Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Failed
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0658 Maryland Legal Services Corporation - End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:16 PM