Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Advance Medical Directives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203 (SB0519)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1261 (SB0820)
Title
Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives – Electronic Execution
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292
Title
Baltimore City - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Social Workers
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519 (HB0203)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0820 (HB1261)
Title
Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives - Electronic Execution
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837
Title
Health - Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0203 (SB0519) Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1261 (SB0820) Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives – Electronic Execution Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1292 Baltimore City - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Social Workers Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
SB0519 (HB0203) Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0820 (HB1261) Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives - Electronic Execution Senator West 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0837 Health - Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 1:34 PM
Click to return on the top page