Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Advertising

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0120 /CH0101
Title
Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product Marketing
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136 /CH0106
Title
Insurance - Public Adjusters
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309 /CH0305
Title
Montgomery County - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival License MC 7-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0398 (SB0404)
Title
Labor and Employment - Salary History Information Disclosures
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0703 (SB0113)
Title
Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762
Title
Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Eligibility Awareness Campaign Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0898 /CH0852
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990
Title
Harford County - Bingo
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1239 (SB0280)
Title
Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and Labeling
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1489
Title
Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0113 (HB0703)
Title
Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118
Title
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 (HB1239)
Title
Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and Labeling
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 /CH0588 (HB0426/CH0589)
Title
Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - On-Premises Promotions and Product Sampling - Holders of Manufacturer's Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0404 (HB0398)
Title
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay - Job Announcement and Salary History Information Disclosures
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847
Title
Retail Service Station Dealers - Gas Prices - Required Signage
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1194
Title
Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcome Partnership Fund
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1200
Title
Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0120 /CH0101 Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product Marketing Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0136 /CH0106 Insurance - Public Adjusters Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0309 /CH0305 Montgomery County - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival License MC 7-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0398 (SB0404) Labor and Employment - Salary History Information Disclosures Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0703 (SB0113) Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0762 Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Eligibility Awareness Campaign Pilot Program Delegate Platt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0898 /CH0852 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0990 Harford County - Bingo Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1022 Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders Delegate West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1239 (SB0280) Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and Labeling Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1489 Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of Prohibition Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0113 (HB0703) Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0118 Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Cecil County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0280 (HB1239) Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and Labeling Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0311 /CH0588 (HB0426/CH0589) Promoting Efficiencies in State Procurement President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0325 Alcoholic Beverages - On-Premises Promotions and Product Sampling - Holders of Manufacturer's Licenses Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0404 (HB0398) Labor and Employment - Equal Pay - Job Announcement and Salary History Information Disclosures Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0847 Retail Service Station Dealers - Gas Prices - Required Signage Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1194 Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcome Partnership Fund Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1200 Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Referred Economic Matters
Finance
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM