Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Age of Majority -see also- Minors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102
Title
Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127 /CH0613 (SB0311)
Title
Gaming - Home Games
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 (SB0483/CH0069)
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Minimum Age to Serve Liquor
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0654 /CH0625
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Ho. Co. 10-16
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0677 (SB1100)
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Age of Majority - Postsecondary Education
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0764 (SB0521)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406 /CH0244 (SB1173/CH0243)
Title
Task Force to Study the Adult High School Concept
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1581 /CH0012
Title
Harford County Deputy Sheriffs Dailey and Logsdon Benefits Memorial Act
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252 /CH0057 (HB0511/CH0058)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental Care
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 (HB0127/CH0613)
Title
Gaming - Home Games
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0483 /CH0069 (HB0543)
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Minimum Age to Serve Liquor
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521 (HB0764)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1100 (HB0677)
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Age of Majority - Postsecondary Education
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1173 /CH0243 (HB1406/CH0244)
Title
Task Force to Study the Adult High School Concept
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0127 /CH0613 (SB0311) Gaming - Home Games Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Ways and Means
2/02/2016 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0543 (SB0483/CH0069) Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Minimum Age to Serve Liquor Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0654 /CH0625 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Ho. Co. 10-16 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0677 (SB1100) Family Law - Child Support - Age of Majority - Postsecondary Education Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0764 (SB0521) Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1406 /CH0244 (SB1173/CH0243) Task Force to Study the Adult High School Concept Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Economic Matters
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1581 /CH0012 Harford County Deputy Sheriffs Dailey and Logsdon Benefits Memorial Act Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB0252 /CH0057 (HB0511/CH0058) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental Care Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Finance
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0311 (HB0127/CH0613) Gaming - Home Games Senator King 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/08/2016 - 11:00 AM
SB0483 /CH0069 (HB0543) Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Minimum Age to Serve Liquor Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0521 (HB0764) Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1100 (HB0677) Family Law - Child Support - Age of Majority - Postsecondary Education Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1173 /CH0243 (HB1406/CH0244) Task Force to Study the Adult High School Concept Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM