Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Age of Majority -see also- Minors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143
Title
Carroll County and Montgomery County – Gaming – Bingo Games MC 13–18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 /CH0125
Title
Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0191 (SB0670)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0466
Title
Baltimore City - Ammunition Sales - Record Keeping
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 (SB0669)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0856 /CH0612 (SB0647/CH0611)
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit – Individuals Without Qualifying Children – Repeal of Minimum Age Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868 (SB0992)
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966 (SB1103)
Title
Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152 (SB0965)
Title
Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of Court
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1264 (SB1039)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1346
Title
Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Authorization and Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1473 /CH0527
Title
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043 /CH0373 (HB0193/CH0374)
Title
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 (HB0827)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB0191)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0965 (HB1152)
Title
Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of Court
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0992 (HB0868)
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1264)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1103 (HB0966)
Title
Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0143 Carroll County and Montgomery County – Gaming – Bingo Games MC 13–18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0178 /CH0125 Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0191 (SB0670) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0466 Baltimore City - Ammunition Sales - Record Keeping Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0827 (SB0669) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0856 /CH0612 (SB0647/CH0611) Earned Income Tax Credit – Individuals Without Qualifying Children – Repeal of Minimum Age Requirement Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0868 (SB0992) Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0966 (SB1103) Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1152 (SB0965) Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of Court Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1264 (SB1039) Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1346 Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Authorization and Implementation Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1473 /CH0527 Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0043 /CH0373 (HB0193/CH0374) High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
SB0439 Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0669 (HB0827) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0670 (HB0191) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0965 (HB1152) Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of Court Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0992 (HB0868) Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1039 (HB1264) Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1103 (HB0966) Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM