Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Agents and Brokers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760 /CH0350
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Brokerage Services - Duties and Obligations
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0774 /CH0223 (SB0380/CH0224)
Title
Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0835
Title
State Lottery - Licensed Agents - Commissions
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964 (SB0702)
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114 (SB0892)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 /CH0837 (SB0951/CH0838)
Title
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0019 /CH0037
Title
Insurance - Surplus Lines Insurers, Surplus Lines Brokers, and Reinsurers
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0043 (HB0800/CH0044)
Title
Insurance Premiums - Payment by Credit Card - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0164
Title
Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning Applications
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0203
Title
Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Village Permit
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380 /CH0224 (HB0774/CH0223)
Title
Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 (HB0964)
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0777
Title
State Lottery - Licensed Agents - Commissions
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB1114)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929 /CH0093 (HB0959/CH0094)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951 /CH0838 (HB1149/CH0837)
Title
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1007
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0760 /CH0350 State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Brokerage Services - Duties and Obligations Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0774 /CH0223 (SB0380/CH0224) Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0835 State Lottery - Licensed Agents - Commissions Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0964 (SB0702) Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Economic Matters
HB1114 (SB0892) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1149 /CH0837 (SB0951/CH0838) Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults Delegate Kramer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0019 /CH0037 Insurance - Surplus Lines Insurers, Surplus Lines Brokers, and Reinsurers Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 /CH0043 (HB0800/CH0044) Insurance Premiums - Payment by Credit Card - Reimbursement for Expenses Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Finance
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0164 Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning Applications Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0203 Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0275 Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Village Permit Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0380 /CH0224 (HB0774/CH0223) Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Finance
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0702 (HB0964) Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Finance
SB0777 State Lottery - Licensed Agents - Commissions Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0892 (HB1114) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0929 /CH0093 (HB0959/CH0094) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Finance
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0951 /CH0838 (HB1149/CH0837) Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1007 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM