Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Aging, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685
Title
Department of Aging - Comprehensive Plan for the Aging Population
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744
Title
Senior Call-Check Service Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746
Title
Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978 (SB0604)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing, Health, and Economic Stability of Maryland Seniors
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090 /CH0130 (SB0670)
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Ho. Co. 15-16
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB0896)
Title
Task Force to Study Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385 /CH0510
Title
Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance Directives
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604 (HB0978)
Title
Task Force on the Distribution of Funding for Senior Citizen Activities Centers
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB1090/CH0130)
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1109 /CH0468
Title
Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Transfer of Senior Community Service Employment Program
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0685 Department of Aging - Comprehensive Plan for the Aging Population Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0744 Senior Call-Check Service Program - Establishment Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0746 Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0978 (SB0604) Task Force to Study Housing, Health, and Economic Stability of Maryland Seniors Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1090 /CH0130 (SB0670) Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Ho. Co. 15-16 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1300 (SB0896) Task Force to Study Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums Delegate Howard, C. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 /CH0510 Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance Directives Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0604 (HB0978) Task Force on the Distribution of Funding for Senior Citizen Activities Centers Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0670 (HB1090/CH0130) Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1109 /CH0468 Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Transfer of Senior Community Service Employment Program Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM