Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Aging, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498
Title
Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 (SB0670)
Title
Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1423
Title
Human Services - Department of Aging - Budget
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1471
Title
Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Delegation of Responsibilities - Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1517
Title
Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program - Social Services
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB0564)
Title
Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB0456)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Public Health Outreach Programs - Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer's Disease, and Other Types of Dementia
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0498 Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs - Funding Delegate Hill 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
HB0564 (SB0670) Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB1423 Human Services - Department of Aging - Budget Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1471 Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Delegation of Responsibilities - Limitation Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1517 Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program - Social Services Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
SB0670 (HB0564) Department of Aging - Assisted Living Program Subsidies - Determinations Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0725 (HB0456) Maryland Department of Health - Public Health Outreach Programs - Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer's Disease, and Other Types of Dementia Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/8/2020 1:45 PM