Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Agriculture, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0359 (SB0280)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381 (SB0257)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514 /CH0429 (SB0258)
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Use of Funds - Compliance With Watershed Implementation Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0701 (SB0463)
Title
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0755 /CH0136 (SB0695/CH0135)
Title
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 /CH0456
Title
Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Legalization
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881 (SB0256)
Title
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0531)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995
Title
Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care Centers, Schools, and Recreation Facilities - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1075 (SB0470)
Title
Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing Animals
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 (HB0881)
Title
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0257 (HB0381)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 (HB0514/CH0429)
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 (HB0359)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463 (HB0701)
Title
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0470 (HB1075)
Title
Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing Animals
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0911)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 /CH0135 (HB0755/CH0136)
Title
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748
Title
Deer Hunting - Crop Damage Permit - Wild Venison
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0860
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Commercial Fertilizer
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2015 - 3:00 PM
Rules
HB0359 (SB0280) Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0381 (SB0257) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0514 /CH0429 (SB0258) Maryland Commission on Climate Change Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0633 Cigarette Restitution Fund - Use of Funds - Compliance With Watershed Implementation Plans Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0701 (SB0463) Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0755 /CH0136 (SB0695/CH0135) General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0803 /CH0456 Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Legalization Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0881 (SB0256) Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 (SB0531) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0995 Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care Centers, Schools, and Recreation Facilities - Prohibition Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1075 (SB0470) Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing Animals Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies President 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 (HB0881) Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0257 (HB0381) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management Tool Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 (HB0514/CH0429) Maryland Commission on Climate Change Senator Pinsky 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0280 (HB0359) Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0463 (HB0701) Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0470 (HB1075) Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing Animals Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 (HB0911) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0695 /CH0135 (HB0755/CH0136) General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0748 Deer Hunting - Crop Damage Permit - Wild Venison Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0860 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Commercial Fertilizer Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM