Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Agriculture, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0452 /CH0291 (SB0389/CH0292)
Title
Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515 /CH0246
Title
Agriculture – Palmer Amaranth – Study
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698 /CH0475
Title
Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732 (SB0675/CH0236)
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 (SB0610)
Title
Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic Review
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Study on Location of Solar Photovoltaic Technologies
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917 /CH0275 (SB1032/CH0274)
Title
Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972 /CH0542
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0980 (SB0700)
Title
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal Refuge
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1221
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management Plans - Protection of Personal Information
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 /CH0628 (SB1006/CH0629)
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1532 /CH0404 (SB0991/CH0405)
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Farmers
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1597 /CH0796
Title
Occupational Licenses or Certificates – Application Determinations – Use of Criminal History – Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1662 /CH0237
Title
Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389 /CH0292 (HB0452/CH0291)
Title
Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 /CH0236 (HB0732)
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 (HB0980)
Title
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal Refuge
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991 /CH0405 (HB1532/CH0404)
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Farmers
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006 /CH0629 (HB1350/CH0628)
Title
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1032 /CH0274 (HB0917/CH0275)
Title
Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1201 /CH0476
Title
Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0452 /CH0291 (SB0389/CH0292) Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal Delegate Carr 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0515 /CH0246 Agriculture – Palmer Amaranth – Study Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0698 /CH0475 Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - Establishment Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0732 (SB0675/CH0236) Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018 Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0766 (SB0610) Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic Review Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (114-25)
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0866 Maryland Energy Administration - Study on Location of Solar Photovoltaic Technologies Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0917 /CH0275 (SB1032/CH0274) Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0972 /CH0542 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery Licenses Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 542
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0980 (SB0700) Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal Refuge Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1221 Agriculture - Nutrient Management Plans - Protection of Personal Information Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1350 /CH0628 (SB1006/CH0629) Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1532 /CH0404 (SB0991/CH0405) Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Farmers Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Ways and Means
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1597 /CH0796 Occupational Licenses or Certificates – Application Determinations – Use of Criminal History – Reports Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 796
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1662 /CH0237 Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0389 /CH0292 (HB0452/CH0291) Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0675 /CH0236 (HB0732) Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018 Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0700 (HB0980) Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal Refuge Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0991 /CH0405 (HB1532/CH0404) Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - Farmers Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1006 /CH0629 (HB1350/CH0628) Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1032 /CH0274 (HB0917/CH0275) Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1201 /CH0476 Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - Establishment Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM