Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

AIDS

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354 /CH0396 (SB0263)
Title
Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761 /CH0422 (SB0874)
Title
Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 (HB0354/CH0396)
Title
Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program
Sponsor
Baltimore City Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0874 (HB0761/CH0422)
Title
Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0354 /CH0396 (SB0263) Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0761 /CH0422 (SB0874) Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs Delegate Hammen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0263 (HB0354/CH0396) Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program Baltimore City Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0874 (HB0761/CH0422) Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM