Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

AIDS

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0973
Title
Local AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978 /CH0112
Title
HIV Testing - Informed Consent and Pretest Requirements - Modification
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1143 (SB0796/CH0384)
Title
Public Health - Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program - Expansion of Eligibility and Services - Pharmaceutical Rebate Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0796 /CH0384 (HB1143)
Title
Public Health - Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program - Expansion of Eligibility and Services - Pharmaceutical Rebate Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0973 Local AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Programs Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0978 /CH0112 HIV Testing - Informed Consent and Pretest Requirements - Modification Delegate Lam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1143 (SB0796/CH0384) Public Health - Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program - Expansion of Eligibility and Services - Pharmaceutical Rebate Coverage Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0796 /CH0384 (HB1143) Public Health - Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program - Expansion of Eligibility and Services - Pharmaceutical Rebate Coverage Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM