Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

AIDS

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180 /CH0441 (SB0856/CH0440)
Title
Public Health - HIV Testing During Pregnancy
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0216 (SB0289)
Title
Public Health - Preventive Medical Care - Consent by Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0468 (SB0097/CH0348)
Title
Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1212
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Use Facility Program
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 /CH0046
Title
Public Health - State-Identified HIV Priorities
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097 /CH0348 (HB0468)
Title
Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0289 (HB0216)
Title
Public Health - Preventive Medical Care - Consent by Minors
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0856 /CH0440 (HB0180/CH0441)
Title
Public Health - HIV Testing During Pregnancy
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0180 /CH0441 (SB0856/CH0440) Public Health - HIV Testing During Pregnancy Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0216 (SB0289) Public Health - Preventive Medical Care - Consent by Minors Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0468 (SB0097/CH0348) Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1212 Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Use Facility Program Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0091 /CH0046 Public Health - State-Identified HIV Priorities Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Finance
1/20/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0097 /CH0348 (HB0468) Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0289 (HB0216) Public Health - Preventive Medical Care - Consent by Minors Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0856 /CH0440 (HB0180/CH0441) Public Health - HIV Testing During Pregnancy Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM