Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

AIDS

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 (SB0135)
Title
Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0828 (SB0836)
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia - Prevention of HIV and Viral Hepatitis
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1183 /CH0727 (SB0251/CH0728)
Title
Public Health - Treatment for the Prevention of HIV - Consent by Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1249 (SB0657/CH0431)
Title
Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 (HB0139)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0728 (HB1183/CH0727)
Title
Public Health - Treatment for the Prevention of HIV - Consent by Minors
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0657 /CH0431 (HB1249)
Title
Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836 (HB0828)
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia - Prevention of HIV and Viral Hepatitis
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0139 (SB0135) Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0828 (SB0836) Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia - Prevention of HIV and Viral Hepatitis Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1183 /CH0727 (SB0251/CH0728) Public Health - Treatment for the Prevention of HIV - Consent by Minors Delegate Hill 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1249 (SB0657/CH0431) Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis Delegate Reznik 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
SB0135 (HB0139) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0251 /CH0728 (HB1183/CH0727) Public Health - Treatment for the Prevention of HIV - Consent by Minors Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 728
Finance
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0657 /CH0431 (HB1249) Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 9:00 AM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0836 (HB0828) Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia - Prevention of HIV and Viral Hepatitis Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:17 PM