Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Aircraft

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0238
Title
Forest Conservation Act - Exemption - Hazards to Air Navigation
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400
Title
State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected Officials
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620
Title
Crimes - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Unauthorized Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0007 (SJ0006)
Title
Business and Economic Development - NASA Wallops Flight Facility - Commercial Rocket Boosters and Spacecraft
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0370 /CH0164
Title
Unmanned Aircraft Systems Research, Development, Regulation, and Privacy Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0899
Title
Offshore Wind - Application for Proposed Project - Evaluation and Approval
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006 (HJ0007)
Title
Business and Economic Development - NASA Wallops Flight Facility - Commercial Rocket Boosters and Spacecraft
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0238 Forest Conservation Act - Exemption - Hazards to Air Navigation Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0400 State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected Officials Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0620 Crimes - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Unauthorized Surveillance Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HJ0007 (SJ0006) Business and Economic Development - NASA Wallops Flight Facility - Commercial Rocket Boosters and Spacecraft Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0370 /CH0164 Unmanned Aircraft Systems Research, Development, Regulation, and Privacy Act of 2015 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0899 Offshore Wind - Application for Proposed Project - Evaluation and Approval Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SJ0006 (HJ0007) Business and Economic Development - NASA Wallops Flight Facility - Commercial Rocket Boosters and Spacecraft Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM