Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Aircraft

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 (SB0116/CH0049)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 (SB0409)
Title
Maryland Aviation Administration - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Management of Food Service and Retail Concessions
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313 (SB0014)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0351
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406 (SB0870)
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471 (SB0622)
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1011
Title
Department of Transportation - Modal Administrations - Appointments
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1452 (SB0902)
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0014 (HB0313)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0115
Title
Property Tax Assessments - Inspection of Property
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0318
Title
Department of Transportation - Heads of Modal Administrations - Senate Confirmation
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0409 (HB0228)
Title
Maryland Aviation Administration - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Management of Food Service and Retail Concessions
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0622 (HB0471)
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0724 /CH0041
Title
Alcoholic Beverages Article
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0870 (HB0406)
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 (HB1452)
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0084 (SB0116/CH0049) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements Speaker 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/02/2016 - 12:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0228 (SB0409) Maryland Aviation Administration - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Management of Food Service and Retail Concessions Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/12/2016 - 12:00 PM
HB0313 (SB0014) Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0351 Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0406 (SB0870) Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0471 (SB0622) Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0777 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1011 Department of Transportation - Modal Administrations - Appointments Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1452 (SB0902) Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0014 (HB0313) Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0115 Property Tax Assessments - Inspection of Property Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0318 Department of Transportation - Heads of Modal Administrations - Senate Confirmation Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0409 (HB0228) Maryland Aviation Administration - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Management of Food Service and Retail Concessions Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0622 (HB0471) Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0724 /CH0041 Alcoholic Beverages Article President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0870 (HB0406) Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0902 (HB1452) Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM