Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Aircraft

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055 /CH0238 (SB0054)
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 (SB0159)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874 /CH0464
Title
Air Navigation Protection From Hazards Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229 (SB1105)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Proximity
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1408
Title
Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Places of Use
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054 (HB0055/CH0238)
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 (HB0067)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1105 (HB1229)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Proximity
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0055 /CH0238 (SB0054) Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0067 (SB0159) Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
1/18/2017 - 11:00 AM
HB0874 /CH0464 Air Navigation Protection From Hazards Act of 2017 Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1229 (SB1105) Correctional Facilities - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Proximity Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1408 Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Places of Use Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0054 (HB0055/CH0238) Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0159 (HB0067) Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1105 (HB1229) Correctional Facilities - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Proximity Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM