Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Aircraft

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125
Title
Criminal Law - Misuse of Laser Pointer
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240 (SB0661)
Title
Law Enforcement - Federal Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0318 (SB0212)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1777 (SB0541)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - The Glenn L. Martin Maryland Aviation Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0102
Title
Airplane Passenger Public Safety Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212 (HB0318)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 (HB1777)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - The Glenn L. Martin Maryland Aviation Museum
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0661 (HB0240)
Title
Law Enforcement - Federal Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0121 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0125 Criminal Law - Misuse of Laser Pointer Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0240 (SB0661) Law Enforcement - Federal Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition Delegate Moon 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0318 (SB0212) Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1777 (SB0541) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - The Glenn L. Martin Maryland Aviation Museum Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
SB0102 Airplane Passenger Public Safety Act of 2018 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0212 (HB0318) Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0541 (HB1777) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - The Glenn L. Martin Maryland Aviation Museum Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0661 (HB0240) Law Enforcement - Federal Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM