Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Aircraft

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0065 (SB0002)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200
Title
Wicomico County – Sales and Use Tax Exemption – Aircraft Parts and Equipment
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 (HB0065)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793 /CH0025 (HB1094)
Title
Community Safety and Strengthening Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0065 (SB0002) Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0200 Wicomico County – Sales and Use Tax Exemption – Aircraft Parts and Equipment Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
SB0002 (HB0065) Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2019 - 10:30 AM
Ways and Means
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0004 Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0793 /CH0025 (HB1094) Community Safety and Strengthening Act Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:17 PM