Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Aircraft

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016 (SB0121/CH0638)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354
Title
Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax – Services, Aircraft Parts and Equipment, and Data Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1395
Title
Public Safety – Persistent Aerial Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 /CH0511
Title
State Board of Pilots - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0121 /CH0638 (HB0016)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0300 (HB0229)
Title
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0005
Title
Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 (SB0121/CH0638) Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/16/2020 - 1:30 PM
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1354 Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax – Services, Aircraft Parts and Equipment, and Data Centers Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Ways and Means
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1395 Public Safety – Persistent Aerial Surveillance Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0071 /CH0511 State Board of Pilots - Sunset Extension Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0121 /CH0638 (HB0016) Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption Senator Eckardt 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 638
Budget and Taxation
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0300 (HB0229) Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SJ0005 Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 1:45 PM