Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Airports

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874 /CH0464
Title
Air Navigation Protection From Hazards Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0515 /CH0182
Title
Collective Bargaining - Firefighters - Martin State Airport
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0874 /CH0464 Air Navigation Protection From Hazards Act of 2017 Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0515 /CH0182 Collective Bargaining - Firefighters - Martin State Airport Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM